WI SB638 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 71.05 (10) (c); and to create 71.05 (10) (c) 2. and 3. of the statutes; Relating to: increasing the net capital loss deduction. (FE)
Title
Increasing the net capital loss deduction. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Kapenga added as a coauthor |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb638 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB638.pdf |