WI SB646 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 66.0615 (1) (bs), 66.0615 (1) (de) and 66.0615 (5); to renumber and amend 59.25 (3) (e); to amend 66.0615 (1) (dk), 66.0615 (1m) (a), 66.0615 (1m) (g), 66.0615 (2) (intro.), 66.0615 (2) (a), 66.0615 (2) (b), 66.0615 (4) (a) (intro.) and 66.1014 (2) (d) 1.; and to create 59.25 (3) (e) 1., 59.25 (3) (e) 2., 66.0615 (1) (bt), 66.0615 (1r), 66.0615 (2) (f), 66.0615 (2m), 66.0615 (4) (a) 4., 66.0615 (4) (d) and 66.1014 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: expanding applicability of the room tax, making substantive and technical changes to the local room tax, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Expanding applicability of the room tax, making substantive and technical changes to the local room tax, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb646 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB646.pdf |