WI SB652 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 801.15 (1) (b) and 938.21 (1) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: hearing timelines for juveniles in custody. (FE)
Title
Hearing timelines for juveniles in custody. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Representative Bowen withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb652 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB652.pdf |