WI SB662 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 59.69 (5) (a), 59.69 (5) (b) and 59.692 (1c); and to create 59.692 (2) (bg) and 992.23 of the statutes; Relating to: town zoning in shorelands, the scope of county shoreland zoning ordinances, and authorizing partial county zoning. (FE)
Title
Town zoning in shorelands, the scope of county shoreland zoning ordinances, and authorizing partial county zoning. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
Rep. Rob Swearingen [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb662 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB662.pdf |