WI SB67 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 77.707 (1), 229.68 (intro.) and 229.685 (2); and to create 229.682 (9) of the statutes; Relating to: lease terms and the imposition of sales and use taxes related to a local professional baseball park district. (FE)
Title
Lease terms and the imposition of sales and use taxes related to a local professional baseball park district. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senator Craig added as a coauthor |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senator Kooyenga added as a coauthor |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Representative Brostoff added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Representative Dittrich added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb67 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB67.pdf |