WI SB670 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 289.63 (6) (d) 1. (intro.), 289.63 (6) (d) 2. a., 289.63 (6) (d) 2. b., 289.63 (6) (d) 3. a., 289.64 (4) (d) 1. (intro.), 289.64 (4) (d) 2. a., 289.64 (4) (d) 2. b., 289.64 (4) (d) 3. a., 289.645 (4) (h) 1. (intro.), 289.645 (4) (h) 2. a., 289.645 (4) (h) 2. b., 289.645 (4) (h) 3. a., 289.67 (1) (fj) 1. (intro.), 289.67 (1) (fj) 2. a., 289.67 (1) (fj) 2. b. and 289.67 (1) (fj) 3. a.; and to create 289.63 (6) (d) 1. c., 289.64 (4) (d) 1. c., 289.645 (4) (h) 1. c. and 289.67 (1) (fj) 1. c. of the statutes; Relating to: exempting certain waste-to-energy facilities from tipping fees. (FE)
Title
Exempting certain waste-to-energy facilities from tipping fees. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Thomas Tiffany [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] |
Rep. Jill Billings [D] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Rep. Steve Doyle [D] |
Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. David Bowen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Bewley and Tiffany |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb670 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB670.pdf |