WI SB68 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Published 7-11-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Published 7-11-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 948.12 (1m) (intro.), 948.12 (1m) (b), 948.12 (1m) (c), 948.12 (2m) (intro.), 948.12 (2m) (b), 948.12 (2m) (c) and 971.23 (11) (b); and to create 948.12 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: possession of child pornography and providing a penalty.
Title
Possession of child pornography and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Senate | Published 7-11-2019 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 7-10-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 16 |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 7-9-2019 |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-06-19 | House | Representative Rohrkaste added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on calendar 6-20-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senator Kooyenga added as a coauthor |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |