WI SB691 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 30.678 (1) (d); to amend 30.678 (1) (b) and 30.678 (1) (c) 2.; and to create 30.678 (1) (d) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: operation of motorboats by minors.
Title
Operation of motorboats by minors.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Rep. Tyler August [R] | Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb691 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB691.pdf |