WI SB7 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 25.46 (5L) and 287.31; and to amend 287.21 (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: the newspaper recycling fee and the recycled content of newsprint used in newspapers. (FE)
Title
The newspaper recycling fee and the recycled content of newsprint used in newspapers. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb7 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB7.pdf |