WI SB7 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Published 4-25-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Published 4-25-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 175.60 (15) (a); and to create 175.60 (15) (a) 1. and 2. of the statutes; Relating to: expiration dates of renewed licenses to carry a concealed weapon.
Title
Expiration dates of renewed licenses to carry a concealed weapon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Published 4-25-2017 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-24-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 5 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-20-2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-03-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-03-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 92, Noes 7 |
2017-03-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-03-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-03-09 | House | Read a second time |
2017-03-09 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2017-03-07 | House | Placed on calendar 3-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-03-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senator Nass added as a coauthor |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced |