WI SB7 | 2017 | January Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-14-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-14-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: grants to establish and expand graduate training in an addiction specialty and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to establish and expand graduate training in an addiction specialty and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/jr7/sen/bill/sb7 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/JR7/SB7.pdf |