WI SB7 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Representative Rohrkaste added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 66.0114 (1) (b); to amend 800.035 (5) (a); and to create 66.0114 (1) (b) 2., 66.0114 (1) (b) 3., 345.26 (1) (b) 3., 800.035 (5) (am) and 967.055 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring persons accused of violating traffic laws and ordinances related to driving while intoxicated to appear in person in court. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring persons accused of violating traffic laws and ordinances related to driving while intoxicated to appear in person in court. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateRepresentative Rohrkaste added as a cosponsor
2019-06-13SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling
2019-05-10SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-28SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-20SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-04SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-02-28SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-02-25SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-01-29SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback