WI SB70 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 302.095 (2); and to create 302.095 (2) (a) 2. and 302.095 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: bringing contraband into a jail or prison and providing a penalty.
Title
Bringing contraband into a jail or prison and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | Published 2-29-2020 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-28-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 111 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-26-2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:26 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-05-28 | House | Representative James added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-15-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |