WI SB71 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 5.05 (11m) and 20.510 (1) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: aids to counties and municipalities for certain special election costs and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Aids to counties and municipalities for certain special election costs and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |