WI SB710 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 145.245 (10m) of the statutes; and to affect 2017 Wisconsin Act 59, section 9439 (4t); Relating to: the private on-site wastewater treatment system replacement or rehabilitation grant program. (FE)
Title
The private on-site wastewater treatment system replacement or rehabilitation grant program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb710 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB710.pdf |