WI SB717 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.115 (7) (cs) and 93.56 of the statutes; Relating to: expanding the clean sweep program to include collection of certain fire fighting foams and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Expanding the clean sweep program to include collection of certain fire fighting foams and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb717 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB717.pdf |