WI SB728 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 48.415 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: termination of parental rights if a child has been placed outside the home for 15 of the last 22 months. (FE)
Title
Termination of parental rights if a child has been placed outside the home for 15 of the last 22 months. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb728 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB728.pdf |