WI SB730 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 48.345 (3) (a) and 48.345 (3) (b); and to create 48.345 (3) (a) 1. and 2., 48.345 (3) (b) 1. and 2. and 48.685 (4m) (b) 2. and 2m. of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting the out-of-home placement of a child with a person with a record of a crime against a child. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting the out-of-home placement of a child with a person with a record of a crime against a child. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] |
Sen. David Hansen [D] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Chris Taylor [D] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] |
Rep. Staush Gruszynski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb730 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB730.pdf |