WI SB734 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 46.977 (2) (a) and 54.15 (8) (a) 1. to 4.; to renumber and amend 46.977 (1) (b); to consolidate, renumber and amend 46.977 (1) (intro.) and (a); to amend 46.977 (2) (b) (intro.), 46.977 (2) (c), 54.15 (8) (a) (intro.) and 54.15 (8) (b); and to create 46.977 (3), 54.15 (8) (a) 2m. and 54.26 of the statutes; Relating to: guardian training requirements and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Guardian training requirements and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 5 offered by Senator Jacque |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senator Jacque |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Jacque |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Jacque |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb734 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB734.pdf |