WI SB74 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 961.39 (3) (b); and to create 961.39 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: prescriptions for controlled substances issued by optometrists and providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures.
Title
Prescriptions for controlled substances issued by optometrists and providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Published 7-2-2015 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 34 |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-06-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a second time |
2015-06-09 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2015-06-03 | House | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-06-03 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-06-03 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 8, Noes 3 |
2015-06-03 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-05-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Health |
2015-04-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senator Erpenbach added as a coauthor |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-21-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |