WI SB742 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 15.193, 15.204, 20.435 (8) (b), 20.435 (8) (c), 20.435 (8) (kw), 20.435 (8) (o) and 20.435 (8) (p); to amend 13.90 (1) (intro.), 13.90 (1m) (a), 13.90 (1m) (b), 15.01 (6) and 20.765 (3) (g); and to create 13.94 (1d), 13.97, 20.765 (3) (cm), 20.765 (3) (kr), 20.923 (6) (fm) and 230.08 (2) (fr) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a legislative office of inspector general and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating a legislative office of inspector general and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb742 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB742.pdf |