WI SB743 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 115.28 (13); to amend 115.28 (13) (title), 115.30 (1), 118.38 (1) (a) 6. and 121.05 (1) (c); and to create 115.28 (13) (b) and (c) and 120.18 (1) (p) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a computerized uniform school budget and accounting system. (FE)
Title
Creating a computerized uniform school budget and accounting system. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb743 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB743.pdf |