WI SB744 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 115.28 (55) (title); and to create 115.28 (56), 118.40 (2r) (b) 2. L., 118.40 (2x) (b) 2. L., 118.60 (2) (a) 9., 119.23 (2) (a) 9. and 121.02 (1) (L) 8. of the statutes; Relating to: incorporating the Holocaust and other genocides into the state model social studies standards and requiring instruction on the Holocaust and other genocides. (FE)
Title
Incorporating the Holocaust and other genocides into the state model social studies standards and requiring instruction on the Holocaust and other genocides. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Representative Hutton added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb744 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB744.pdf |