WI SB747 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 456.01 (5) and (6); to amend 440.08 (2) (a) (intro.) and 456.10 (2); and to create 227.03 (4r) and 440.077 of the statutes; Relating to: allowing the department of safety and professional services and credentialing boards to grant credentials with provisional status, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Allowing the department of safety and professional services and credentialing boards to grant credentials with provisional status, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Craig added as a coauthor |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb747 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB747.pdf |