WI SB751 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 250.04 (2) (a) and 323.02 (16) (intro.), (a) and (b) 2.; and to create 20.435 (1) (by) and 323.135 of the statutes; Relating to: agency authority regarding public health emergencies and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Agency authority regarding public health emergencies and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb751 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB751.pdf |