WI SB752 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 302.113 (8m) (a), 302.114 (8m) (a), 304.06 (3) and 973.10 (2) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: recommendation to revoke parole, probation, and extended supervision if a person is charged with a crime. (FE)
Title
Recommendation to revoke parole, probation, and extended supervision if a person is charged with a crime. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Representative Sortwell withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb752 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB752.pdf |