WI SB755 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.193 (1m) (a) 2. (intro.), 29.193 (1m) (a) 3., 29.193 (2) (b) 2., 29.193 (2) (c) 3., 29.193 (2) (cd) 2. b., 29.193 (2) (cd) 2. c., 29.193 (2) (e) and 29.193 (3) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: hunting and fishing approvals for persons with disabilities. (FE)
Title
Hunting and fishing approvals for persons with disabilities. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Representative Spiros added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb755 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB755.pdf |