WI SB757 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 134.65 (1); to amend 134.65 (title), 134.65 (1m), 134.65 (1r), 134.65 (4), 134.65 (5m) and 134.65 (8); and to create 20.566 (1) (am) and 134.65 (1a) of the statutes; Relating to: licenses for the retail sale of vapor products and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Licenses for the retail sale of vapor products and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb757 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB757.pdf |