WI SB762 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 29.184 (6g) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: the governor's bear tag.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The governor's bear tag.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-03-06SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-03-05SenateExecutive action taken
2020-02-25SenatePublic hearing held
2020-01-29SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry
2020-01-29SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback