WI SB776 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-8)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Fiscal estimate received
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 28.; and to create 224.55 of the statutes; Relating to: requiring the Department of Financial Institutions to implement a section 529A ABLE savings account program and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the Department of Financial Institutions to implement a section 529A ABLE savings account program and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateFiscal estimate received
2020-02-18SenateFiscal estimate received
2020-02-17SenateRepresentative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor
2020-02-06SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback