WI SB782 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 969.03 (1) (intro.); and to create 969.02 (1m) and 969.03 (1g) of the statutes; Relating to: bail for a criminal defendant who is charged with bail jumping.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bail for a criminal defendant who is charged with bail jumping.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-03-17SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 4, Noes 1
2020-03-17SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 4, Noes 1
2020-03-17SenateExecutive action taken
2020-02-21SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
2020-02-20SenatePublic hearing held
2020-02-06SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback