WI SB789 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 118.52 (3) (d); to renumber and amend 118.52 (4); to amend 115.28 (54m), 115.38 (1) (d), 115.385 (4), 118.52 (1) (e), 118.52 (2), 118.52 (3) (a), 118.52 (3) (b), 118.52 (3) (c), 118.52 (3) (e), 118.52 (5), 118.52 (6), 118.52 (8), 118.52 (9), 118.52 (10), 118.52 (11), 118.52 (12) and 118.57 (1); to repeal and recreate 118.52 (title); and to create 118.52 (1) (ad), 118.52 (1) (af), 118.52 (1) (ah), 118.52 (2m) and 118.52 (13) of the statutes; Relating to: expanding the part-time open enrollment program. (FE)
Title
Expanding the part-time open enrollment program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb789 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB789.pdf |