WI SB795 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 5.05 (2m) (a), 6.56 (4) and 7.15 (1) (g); and to create 5.05 (2m) (fg) of the statutes; Relating to: investigations by the Elections Commission based on information from the Electronic Registration Information Center and from municipal clerks indicating that Wisconsin registered voters may have voted more than once in the same election, and complaints filed with the Elections Commission alleging election law violations. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Investigations by the Elections Commission based on information from the Electronic Registration Information Center and from municipal clerks indicating that Wisconsin registered voters may have voted more than once in the same election, and complaints filed with the Elections Commission alleging election law violations. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-26SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 4, Noes 1
2020-02-26SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-02-26SenateExecutive action taken
2020-02-17SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier
2020-02-12SenateRepresentative Wichgers added as a cosponsor
2020-02-12SenatePublic hearing held
2020-02-11SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues
2020-02-11SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback