WI SB808 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 93.90 (2) (c), 93.90 (3) (a) (intro.), 93.90 (3) (a) 5., 93.90 (3) (a) 6., 93.90 (3) (a) 8., 93.90 (3) (a) 9., 93.90 (3) (ae), 93.90 (3) (am), 93.90 (3) (ar) and 93.90 (4); to renumber 93.90 (3) (a) 1., 93.90 (3) (a) 3., 93.90 (3) (a) 4. and 93.90 (3) (f); to renumber and amend 93.90 (3) (a) 2., 93.90 (3) (b), 93.90 (3) (c), 93.90 (3) (d) and 93.90 (3) (e); to amend 93.90 (1m) (b), 93.90 (2) (a), 93.90 (2) (d), 93.90 (2) (e) 2., 93.90 (5) (title), 93.90 (5) (a), 93.90 (5) (b), 93.90 (5) (bm), 93.90 (5) (c), 93.90 (5) (d) and 93.90 (5) (f); to repeal and recreate 93.90 (3) (title); and to create 15.135 (2), 93.90 (1m) (bm), 93.90 (1m) (dr), 93.90 (1m) (eg), 93.90 (1m) (er), 93.90 (1m) (g), 93.90 (1m) (h), 93.90 (1m) (i), 93.90 (2) (am), 93.90 (2) (f), 93.90 (2m), 93.90 (3) (g), 93.90 (3) (h) (intro.), 93.90 (3) (h) 5., 93.90 (3) (i) 1., 93.90 (3) (i) 2. (intro.), 93.90 (3) (j), 93.90 (3) (L) and 93.90 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: livestock facility siting and expansion and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Livestock facility siting and expansion and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 5, Noes 4 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb808 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB808.pdf |