WI SB822 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 175.60 (2g) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: possession of a firearm in a place of worship by a person who has a license to carry a concealed weapon.
Title
Possession of a firearm in a place of worship by a person who has a license to carry a concealed weapon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Representative Plumer added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb822 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB822.pdf |