WI SB84 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 84.10395 of the statutes; Relating to: designating and marking STH 33 in Columbia County as the Staff Sergeant Daniel D. Busch Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating and marking STH 33 in Columbia County as the Staff Sergeant Daniel D. Busch Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-05-30SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-05-30SenateExecutive action taken
2019-05-21SenatePublic hearing held
2019-04-03SenateRepresentative Kulp added as a cosponsor
2019-03-27SenateRepresentative Skowronski added as a cosponsor
2019-03-15SenateRepresentative Bowen added as a cosponsor
2019-03-07SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback