WI SB86 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Published 11-23-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Published 11-23-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 340.01 (32) (a) (intro.); to renumber 340.01 (32) (a) 1., 340.01 (32) (a) 2. and 340.01 (32) (b); to renumber and amend 990.01 (43m); to amend 20.395 (5) (dr), 20.395 (5) (eh), 85.30, 340.01 (29m) (am) 2., 340.01 (32) (intro.), 340.01 (38m) (a) 1., 341.10 (6), 343.03 (3) (a), 343.04 (1) (e), 343.05 (3) (b), 343.07 (1g) (intro.), 343.07 (4) (title) and (a), 343.07 (4) (b), 343.08 (1) (a), 343.08 (2) (a), 343.16 (1) (d) 1., 343.16 (2) (b), 343.17 (3) (c) 5., 343.32 (4), 346.54 (1) (cm), 346.595 (1), 346.595 (3), 346.595 (3m), 347.09 (1) (b), 347.15 (1), 347.35 (1a), 347.42, 347.485 (title) and (1), 347.485 (2) (c), 347.485 (3), 347.485 (4), 347.486 (1), 347.486 (2), 347.487 and 990.01 (43r); and to create 340.01 (3m) and 341.25 (1) (bg) of the statutes; Relating to: registration and operation of vehicles defined as autocycles. (FE)
Title
Registration and operation of vehicles defined as autocycles. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-12 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | Published 11-23-2019 |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-22-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 50 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 95, Noes 0 |
2019-11-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-12 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Representative Considine added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Senator Wirch added as a coauthor |
2019-09-19 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1) |
2019-09-19 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1) |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senator Olsen added as a coauthor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |