WI SB882 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.11 (22m) and 38.12 (16) of the statutes; Relating to: reasonable accommodations for University of Wisconsin System and technical college students who are victims of sexual violence and harassment. (FE)
Title
Reasonable accommodations for University of Wisconsin System and technical college students who are victims of sexual violence and harassment. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Testin [R] | Sen. Patty Schachtner [D] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] |
Rep. Chris Taylor [D] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb882 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB882.pdf |