WI SB90 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 73.03 (75) of the statutes; Relating to: disclosure of information regarding state revenue.
Title
Disclosure of information regarding state revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senator Nass added as a coauthor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb90 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB90.pdf |