WI SB91 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-14)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 283.84 (1m) (d); and to create 16.9685, 283.84 (1) (f), 283.84 (1) (g), 283.84 (1m) (e) and 283.84 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: buying and selling water pollution credits through a central clearinghouse. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Buying and selling water pollution credits through a central clearinghouse. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenatePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 151
2020-02-28SenatePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020
2020-02-21SenateLRB correction (Senate Amendment 1)
2020-02-21SenateLRB correction
2020-02-21SenateReport correctly enrolled
2020-02-19SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2020-02-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-18HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-18HouseRules suspended
2020-02-18HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-18HouseRead a second time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-02-13HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2019-05-15HouseReceived from Senate
2019-05-15SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-05-15SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0
2019-05-15SenateRules suspended
2019-05-15SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-05-15SenateSenate Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 30, Noes 2
2019-05-15SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2019-05-15SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 adopted
2019-05-15SenateSenator Carpenter added as a coauthor
2019-05-15SenateRead a second time
2019-05-14SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Tiffany
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on calendar 5-15-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-04-04SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-04-04SenateRepresentative Felzkowski withdrawn as a cosponsor
2019-03-29SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-03-29SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-03-29SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-03-29SenateReport introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-03-27SenateExecutive action taken
2019-03-26SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles
2019-03-20SenateSenator Hansen added as a coauthor
2019-03-19SenatePublic hearing held
2019-03-14SenateRepresentative Subeck added as a cosponsor
2019-03-13SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback