WI SB92 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 64.09 (3); and to create 66.0502 (4) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing limited residency requirements for a city or village operating under the city manager plan. (FE)
Title
Authorizing limited residency requirements for a city or village operating under the city manager plan. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb92 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB92.pdf |