WI SB921 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-21 - Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-21 - Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 6.86 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: registering to vote and obtaining a ballot by an agent during a state of emergency.
Title
Registering to vote and obtaining a ballot by an agent during a state of emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-21 | Senate | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor |
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Representatives Hebl, Sinicki, Bowen, Crowley, Zamarripa, Cabrera, C. Taylor and Vruwink added as cosponsors |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb921 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB921.pdf |