WI SJR11 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: honoring the life and public service of Joe Polasek.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring the life and public service of Joe Polasek.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateNot published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 4
2019-07-03SenateDeposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 7-3-2019
2019-06-25SenateReport correctly enrolled
2019-06-18SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2019-06-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-06-18HouseConcurred in
2019-06-13HousePlaced on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-06-10HouseRead and referred to committee on Rules
2019-05-15HouseReceived from Senate
2019-05-15SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-05-15SenateAdopted
2019-05-15SenateRead
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on calendar 5-15-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-04-16SenateRepresentative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor
2019-03-12SenateRepresentative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor
2019-03-07SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-03-07SenateRead and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback