WI SJR25 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-25 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-25 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing September 1 to 7, 2019, as Resiliency Week.
Title
Recognizing September 1 to 7, 2019, as Resiliency Week.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Concurred in |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-10 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-05-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-15-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Introduced |