WI SJR55 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: celebrating Wisconsin's history of sports excellence through recognizing the three most recent MVPs and proclaiming December 1 to December 7, 2019, as MVP Week in Wisconsin.
Title
Celebrating Wisconsin's history of sports excellence through recognizing the three most recent MVPs and proclaiming December 1 to December 7, 2019, as MVP Week in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/joint_resolution/sjr55 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SJR55.pdf |