WI SJR59 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To create section 10 (1) (d) of article V of the constitution; Relating to: prohibiting the governor from using the partial veto to increase state expenditures (first consideration).
Title
Prohibiting the governor from using the partial veto to increase state expenditures (first consideration).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and adopted (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Placed at the foot of the 11th on the calendar of 11-5-2019 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Placed at the foot of the 11th on the calendar of 11-5-2019 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and adopted, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Placed at the foot of the 11th on the calendar of 11-5-2019, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Report adoption recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Risser |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Introduced |