WI SJR67 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-14)
Status: Enrolled on November 13 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-04 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 13 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-04 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the life and public service of Dennis Burns.
Title
Honoring the life and public service of Dennis Burns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-04 | Senate | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 7 |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 11-25-2019 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Concurred in |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-01 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Bernier, Craig, Fitzgerald, Jacque, Kapenga, Kooyenga, LeMahieu, Marklein, Roth, Smith, Stroebel and Testin of the Senate added as coauthors |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Introduced |