WI SJR78 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-10)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: honoring the life and public service of Representative Terry Musser.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring the life and public service of Representative Terry Musser.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateReport correctly enrolled
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseConcurred in
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2020-02-18HousePlaced on calendar 2-20-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-02-06HouseRead and referred to committee on Rules
2020-01-21HouseReceived from Senate
2020-01-21SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-21SenateBewley, Craig, Darling, Erpenbach, Feyen, Fitzgerald, Hansen, Jacque, Johnson, Kapenga, Kooyenga, L. Taylor, Larson, LeMahieu, Marklein, Petrowski, Ringhand, Roth, Schachtner, Shilling, Smith, Stroebel, Testin, Tiffany, Wanggaard and Wirch of the Senate added as coauthors
2020-01-21SenateAdopted by unanimous rising vote
2020-01-21SenateRead
2020-01-17SenatePlaced on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-11-27SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-11-27SenateRead and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
2019-11-27SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback