WV HB113 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Approved by Governor 6/28/19 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Approved by Governor 6/28/19 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create a decreasing modification for personal income tax and corporation net income tax for income derived from businesses activity in qualified opportunity zones in West Virginia.
Title
Establishing tax incentive for new business activity in qualified opportunity zones
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 69) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 68) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 851) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 824) (Y: 42 N: 54 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - House - Constitutional Rule Suspension Rejected (Roll No. 767) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 68) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 851) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 824) (Y: 42 N: 54 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - House - Constitutional Rule Suspension Rejected (Roll No. 767) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 6/28/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-06-28 | House | Approved by Governor 6/28/19 |
2019-07-23 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-06-28 | House | To Governor 6/28/19 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 69) |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 68) |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-06-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-06-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 851) |
2019-06-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-06-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-06-17 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 824) |
2019-06-17 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2019-06-17 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-06-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-06-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-05-20 | House | Constitutional Rule Suspension Rejected (Roll No. 767) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-05-20 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-05-20 | House | Reference dispensed |
2019-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1014 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - To Rules
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 12k | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 24 | 6b | New Code | See Bill Text |