WV HB120 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - On 3rd reading with right to amend, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - On 3rd reading with right to amend, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this supplemental appropriation bill is to add a new item of appropriation from the State Fund, General Revenue for the fiscal year 2019.
Title
Supplementary appropriation to the Department of Transportation
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, House Calendar |
2019-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2019-06-19 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2019-06-18 | House | Amendments pending |
2019-06-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-06-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-06-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-06-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-05-20 | House | Do pass |
2019-05-20 | House | To House Finance |
2019-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-05-20 | House | To Finance |
2019-05-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1016 (Similar To) 2019-06-01 - Approved by Governor 5/28/19 - Senate Journal